|
09/28/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 220, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2020
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4383.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2020
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2020
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2020
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4826.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2020
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2020
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|