|
09/18/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 103, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5316.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2020
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4385.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2020
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2020
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2020
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4771.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|