Assembly | 06/03/2020 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2020 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2020 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2020 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2020 | Read first time. To print. |