California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2844 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2020

Amended

Bill August 1, 2020
Bill May 4, 2020