Assembly | 02/03/2020 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2020 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2019 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2019 | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2019 | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 28. | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2019 | Read first time. To print. |