Senate | 07/01/2020 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2020 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4773.) | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2020 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2020 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3). | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2020 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2020 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2020 | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2020 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2020 | Introduced. To print. |