Assembly | 05/07/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2020 | Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2020 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2020 | Introduced. To print. |