Senate | 08/20/2020 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/17/2020 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 08/08/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (August 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2020 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2020 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/15/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 4886.) | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2020 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2020 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 3). | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2020 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2020 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2020 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2020 | Introduced. To print. |