Senate | 08/18/2020 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2020 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2020 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 18. Page 4752.) | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2020 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2020 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 20). | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2020 | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2020 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2020 | Introduced. To print. |