California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2944 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 18, 2020

Amended

Bill August 14, 2020
Bill August 12, 2020
Bill July 21, 2020