Senate | 08/11/2020 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2020 | Referred to Com. on EQ. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2020 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 16. Page 4692.) | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2020 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (May 13). | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2020 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2020 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2020 | Introduced. To print. |