Senate
|
07/16/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2020
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 17. Page 4916.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2020
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4849.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (June 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (May 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2020
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2020
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2020
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|