Senate | 07/01/2020 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2020 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4793.) | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2020 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2020 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3). | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2020 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2020 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2020 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2020 | Introduced. To print. |