|
09/05/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 224, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2019
|
Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2019
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2019
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2019
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2019
|
Action rescinded whereby bill was ordered to enrollment and whereby the bill was enrolled and presented to the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1876.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 918.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2019
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2019
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|