Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Cristina Garcia.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 27. Noes 21. Page 4733.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 4700.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (June 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2020
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2020
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2020
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2020
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2020
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|