Senate
|
07/14/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2020
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 13. Page 4802.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (June 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2020
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2020
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2020
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2020
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|