Senate
|
09/05/2019
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hill.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 8. Page 1861.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 1.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|