Assembly | 06/03/2020 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2020 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2020 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2020 | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2020 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2020 | Introduced. To print. |