Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2020
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (August 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2020
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/21/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 19. Page 4722.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 4700.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2020
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2020
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2020
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|