|
10/08/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 607, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/17/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2019
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2711.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2021.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 1.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|