California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3040 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2020

Amended

Bill July 28, 2020
Bill July 7, 2020
Bill May 11, 2020
Bill May 4, 2020