Senate | 07/01/2020 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2020 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4776.) | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2020 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3). | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2020 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2020 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2020 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2020 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2020 | Introduced. To print. |