California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3056 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2020

Amended

Bill August 20, 2020
Bill July 8, 2020
Bill June 10, 2020
Bill May 11, 2020
Bill May 4, 2020