|
10/02/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 421, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3406.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2747.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1794.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2019
|
In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2019
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 1.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|