Assembly | 06/03/2020 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2020 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2020 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2020 | Referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2020 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2020 | Introduced. To print. |