Assembly | 06/03/2020 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2020 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2020 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2020 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (May 5). | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2020 | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2020 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2020 | Introduced. To print. |