09/27/2020 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 189, Statutes of 2020. | |||
09/27/2020 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 08/27/2020 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2020 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/24/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4290.). | ||
Senate | 08/01/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/31/2020 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 30). | ||
Senate | 06/23/2020 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2020 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4682.) | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2020 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 27). | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2020 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2020 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2020 | Introduced. To print. |