|
01/21/2020
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2019
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/24/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 12. Page 3480.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2822.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 1862.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2019
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|