|
09/30/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 358, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2020
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 4405.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2020
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (August 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 11. Page 4693.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (June 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2020
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2020
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2020
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2020
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|