Senate | 06/23/2020 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2020 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4603.) | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2020 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 12). | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2020 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2020 | Introduced. To print. |