California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB317 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2019

Amended

Bill June 6, 2019
Bill May 17, 2019
Bill February 26, 2019