|
09/30/2020
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/15/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 16. Page 5454.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2020
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (August 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2020
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 17. Page 4916.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (June 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2020
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2020
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2020
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2020
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2020
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|