Assembly | 02/03/2020 | Died on third reading file. | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2020 | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 3893.) | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2020 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2020 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 23). | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2019 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2019 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 13). | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2019 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2019 | Read first time. To print. |