|
09/30/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 334, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/15/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 10.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
(Ayes 29. Noes 10.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 26. Page 5183.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 12. Page 5181.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5165.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (August 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2020
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 25. Page 5069.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2020
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 40. Noes 18. Page 5067.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2020
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 5059.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2020
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2020
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2020
|
Assembly Rule 78 suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 5059.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Gloria.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2020
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2020
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2020
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2020
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|