Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3908.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/17/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2020
|
(pending re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2020
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3769.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|