Assembly | 02/03/2020 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2020 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2019 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2019 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 12/04/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. | ||
Assembly | 12/03/2018 | Read first time. To print. |