|
09/30/2020
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 12. Page 5467.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 5466.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 4.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2020
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 8. Page 1864.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2019
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|