California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3312 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2020

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2020

Amended

Bill August 13, 2020
Bill July 31, 2020
Bill July 23, 2020
Bill May 4, 2020