California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB332 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2019

Enrolled

Bill August 20, 2019

Chaptered

Bill August 30, 2019

Amended

Bill July 1, 2019
Bill June 14, 2019
Bill May 20, 2019
Bill March 18, 2019
Bill February 15, 2019