Assembly | 05/07/2020 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2020 | Referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2020 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2020 | Introduced. To print. |