05/23/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 6, Statutes of 2019. | |||
05/23/2019 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2019 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1033.). | ||
Senate | 05/08/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2019 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 7). | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 778.) | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2019 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 13). | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2019 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2019 | Read first time. To print. |