California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3372 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 16, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2020

Amended

Bill July 22, 2020
Bill May 11, 2020