California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB342 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 12, 2019

Amended

Bill August 21, 2019
Bill April 11, 2019
Bill March 7, 2019