California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB345 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2019

Amended

Bill August 7, 2020
Bill January 23, 2020
Bill April 29, 2019
Bill April 3, 2019
Bill March 26, 2019