01/21/2020 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |||
10/13/2019 | Vetoed by Governor. | |||
Assembly | 09/11/2019 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/06/2019 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/05/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2573.). | ||
Senate | 08/30/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 30). | ||
Senate | 08/30/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2019 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/12/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2019 | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1403.) | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24). | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2019 | Referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2019 | Read first time. To print. |