|
08/30/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 173, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 7. Page 2717.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 1992.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 7. Page 915.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (March 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|