Assembly
|
02/03/2020
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2020
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 11). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|