Assembly | 02/03/2020 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2020 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2019 | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2019 | Read first time. To print. |