Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 1802.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2019
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|