Senate | 08/30/2019 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2019 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2019 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2019 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2019 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1855.). | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16). | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 12/04/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. | ||
Assembly | 12/03/2018 | Read first time. To print. |